+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Registered Nurses – Delegation of Tasks
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {606080/1 Adopted
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Nursing Tasks
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 8-6A-02 - Article - Health Occupations
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2020: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
February 5, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor