+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (88-47)
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Bates) Adopted
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 10, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 47