+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {749334/1 Report Adopted
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {695761/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
April 2, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 29, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor