+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (38-9)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-2)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {670814/1 Report Adopted
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
670814/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 9
March 13, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 2
March 10, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor