+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-103 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 29, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 19, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 19, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor