+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Care Commission – Patient Safety Center – Designation and Fund
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 530
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Referred Finance
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
- Text - Third - Maryland Health Care Commission – Patient Safety Center – Designation and Fund
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission – Patient Safety Center – Designation and Fund
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 18, 2022: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
March 17, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
March 9, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor