+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (111-26)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
- Favorable with Amendments {182215/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Judiciary
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Amendment
182215/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-105 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 26
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor