+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-1)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 764762/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
764762/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-601 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
April 5, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 28, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor