+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 338573/1 Report Adopted
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 262511/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-10A-15 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 28, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 28, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 42
March 15, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor