+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-1)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-10)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {286081/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/03 at 3:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
286081/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 7-405 through 7-416 - Article - General Provisions
- 7-405 - Article - General Provisions
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
March 18, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 10
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor