+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (127-11)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {374963/1 Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
374963/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 127
- Nays: 11
February 29, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor