+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (89-48)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment {276784/1 Adopted
- Floor Amendment {103726/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-88)
- Favorable with Amendments {676788/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2017: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 22, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 48
March 21, 2017: House Floor - Floor Amendment {103726/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 88
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor