+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-3)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {808270/1 Report Adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendment
808270/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-201 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 3
April 4, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 2, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47