+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {724834/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-6)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
724834/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-410 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 17, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 6
March 16, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor