+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {944061/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
944061/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 29, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2017: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 16, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
+ − Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor