+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Hough) Adopted
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Smith) Adopted
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (94-39)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {944866/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Higher Education - Hunger-Free Campus Grant Program - Established
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-1701 through 11-1706 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (94-39)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 39
March 11, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor