+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {584337/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (129-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {905762/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor