+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-2)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (125-11)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates Morhaim, Hammen, and Kach
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {528178/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (126-10)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {613127/1 Rejected (33-82)
- Special Order until later today (Delegate Schulz) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {486688/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 13-3301 through 13-3303 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3304 through 13-3306 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3307 through 13-3311 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3307 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3310 - Article - Health - General
- 13-3311 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 11
April 1, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 30, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 12, 2014: House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schulz) {613127/1 Rejected
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 82
+ − Sponsors (80)
Type:
Primary Sponsor