+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-3)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {275265/1 Report Adopted
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
275265/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-301.1 - Article - Election Law
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 3
March 9, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor