+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Rules
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Text - Third - Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {730215/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- Yeas: 133
February 2, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor