+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 293890/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
293890/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- 1-101 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 1-203 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 1-301 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-104 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-107 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-108 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-109 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-110 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-111 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-112 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-113 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-115 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 3-203 - Article - Corporations and Associations
- 12-101 - Article - Tax - Property
- 12-103 - Article - Tax - Property
- 12-109 - Article - Tax - Property
- 13-101 - Article - Tax - Property
- 13-404 - Article - Tax - Property
- 14-113 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 25, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor