+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Small Commercial Projects – Alterations
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Small Commercial Projects – Alterations
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Small Commercial Projects – Alterations
- Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Statute Amended
- 5A-303 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Yeas: 136
March 20, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
January 29, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor