+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-3)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analysis
+ − Statute Amended
- 21-902.2 - Article - Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2018: House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor