+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (113-20)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {205069/1 Adopted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Out-of-Home Placement Data
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 24-701, 24-702, 24-703, 24-703.1, 24-707 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (113-20)
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 20
January 29, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor