+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 31, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 17, 2016: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
+ − Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor