+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (127-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {184939/2 Report Adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {233699/2 Report Adopted
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 10-202 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 10-204 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 1-102 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 15-101 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 15-109 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 15-112 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 9-204.3 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
- 15-807 - Article - State Government
- 9-204.1 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 127
March 27, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 7, 2014: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor