+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 15, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 12, 2013: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor