+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (130-0)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Text - First - Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-113, 11B-111.8 - Article - Real Property
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2021: Third Reading Passed (130-0)
- Yeas: 130
February 2, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor