+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
- Favorable with Amendments {296484/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
296484/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2016: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor