+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (41-0)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 624263/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
624263/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 28, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 41
March 11, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 10, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor