+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (123-15)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
- Favorable with Amendments 877971/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
On March 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (119-12)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
- Favorable with Amendments 716387/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 1, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 15
March 31, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 15, 2019: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 15, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor