+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (132-3)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {327276/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-2)
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {646181/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 27, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 3
March 23, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 15, 2014: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor