+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Passed Enrolled
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
- Favorable with Amendments 609738/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 465962/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-716 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 25, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 14, 2019: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor