+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 45
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Sodomy – Repeal
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (124-4)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {908475/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-5)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sodomy and Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {722811/1 Adopted
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Text - First - Criminal Law - Sodomy and Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 10-905, 3-801 - Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
- 2-201, 3-321, 3-322, 3-602, 3-604, 3-809 - Article - Criminal Law
- 10-105, 11-1007, 11-701 - Article - Criminal Procedure
- 5-701 - Article - Family Law
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (124-4)
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 4
March 18, 2020: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Yeas: 44
February 20, 2020: Third Reading Passed (133-5)
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 5
February 17, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
January 14, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor