+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {283525/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Budget and Taxation
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {903622/1 Adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
- Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 7-208 - Article - Tax - Property
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2022: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
April 6, 2022: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 7, 2022: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 3, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor