+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Enrolled - Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- House Concurs Senate Amendments
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment {903926/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (127-0)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Text - Third - Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Text - First - Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 17-315 - Article - Business Occupations and Professions
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2022: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
March 31, 2022: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
March 4, 2022: Third Reading Passed (127-0)
- Yeas: 127
February 4, 2022: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor