+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {665369/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
665369/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 7, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
March 6, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor