+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 5, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
March 2, 2015: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
Type:
Primary Sponsor