+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates James, Haynes, and Szeliga
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {764731/1 Report Adopted
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (131-0)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {934768/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reassigned to Appropriations
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
March 24, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 14, 2014: House - Committee - Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor