+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (113-19)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Statute Amended
- 6-417 - Article - Environment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
March 15, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 19
March 12, 2013: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor