+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On March 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2018: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 15, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor