+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Bates, Kagan, and Simonaire
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Refuses to Recede
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- House Requests Senate Recede
- House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Delegates Stein, Frush, and Flanagan
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {714439/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {220510/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
April 4, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 16, 2015: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor