+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing cancelled
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (105-34)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 13, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 34
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor