+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-1)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {246083/1 Report Adopted
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing cancelled
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
+ − Amendment
246083/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2015: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 31, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2015: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
March 17, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor