+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
- Hearing cancelled
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
On March 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {125865/1 Report Adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
125865/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
March 16, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor