+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-12)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Referred Finance
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (97-39)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {576685/1 Adopted
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading Health and Government Operations
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
- Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
On August 3, 2020 in the House:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 13-4201 through 13-4207, 4-302.3 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
March 29, 2021: Third Reading Passed (33-12)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 12
March 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (97-39)
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 39