+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
- First Reading Senate Rules
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments 912315/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
- First Reading Judiciary
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
912315/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 31, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor