+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (119-20)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {467176/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (107-34)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {683193/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
April 3, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 20
April 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 15, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor