+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Referred Rules
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (103-35)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Text - Third - Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {445466/1 Adopted
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
- Text - First - Public Schools - Centers for Disease Control and Prevention Surveys - Revisions
- Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
April 7, 2021: Third Reading Passed (103-35)
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 35
January 29, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor