+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- House Concur - Senate Amendments
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {664236/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-2)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {635867/1 Report Adopted
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2015: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 31, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 11, 2015: House - Committee - Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor